NM SB329 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 174 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 174 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opening Public Schools On Tribal Land
Title
Opening Public Schools On Tribal Land
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 174 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0 |
2019-03-09 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-01 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HSEIC |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-29 | Senate | SIAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SIAC - Referrals: SIAC/SEC |