NM SB328 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 253 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 253 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Orders Of Protection & Firearm Ownership
Title
Orders Of Protection & Firearm Ownership
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Armstrong [D] | Sen. Joseph Cervantes [D] | Sen. Antoinette Sedillo Lopez [D] | Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 253 - Apr. 4 |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:38 N:31 |
2019-03-13 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-07 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:27 N:15 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | fl/aaaaaaaaa |
2019-03-02 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-08 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |