NM SB319 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.120.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.120.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County irb projects & complaint process
Title
County irb projects & complaint process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | [LD 48] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.120. |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Passed House (46-19) |
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] HWMC |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Passed Senate (33-7) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-23 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-01-23 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |