NM SB306 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Wine & Beer Sales & Private Celebrations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wine & Beer Sales & Private Celebrations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-16SenatePocket Veto
2019-03-16HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0
2019-03-13HouseHSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-11HouseHCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-01HouseSent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HSEIC
2019-02-28SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0
2019-02-26SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-20SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-22SenateSent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCORC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback