NM SB302 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - [LD 21] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - [LD 21] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bed & breakfast beer & wine permits
Title
Bed & breakfast beer & wine permits
Sponsors
Sen. Phil Griego [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | [LD 21] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date. | |
2012-02-19 | [LD 26] Passed House (57-13) | |
2012-02-19 | [LD 26] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-02-16 | [LD 23] Referred to House Business & Industry | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Passed Senate (33-0) | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Public Affairs |