NM SB3 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 5 - Mar. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Small Business Recovery Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business Recovery Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenateSigned by Governor - Chapter 5 - Mar. 3
2021-02-25HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:51 N:17
2021-02-23HouseHTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-02-11HouseSent to HTRC - Referrals: HTRC
2021-02-10SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:35 N:3
2021-02-10SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2021-02-01SenateSTBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-01-19SenateSent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback