NM SB3 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 6 - July 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Small Business Recovery Act Of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business Recovery Act Of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22SenateSigned by Governor - Chapter 6 - July 7
2020-06-22HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:59 N:5
2020-06-20HouseHCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-06-19HouseSent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC
2020-06-19SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:26 N:11
2020-06-19Senatemultiple floor amendments
2020-06-18SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-06-18SenateSent to SFC - Referrals: SFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback