NM SB3 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Early Childhood Education & Care Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early Childhood Education & Care Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HouseAction Postponed Indefinitely
2020-02-06HouseSent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC
2020-02-05SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0
2020-02-04SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-01-27SenateSEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-01-22SenateSCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
2020-01-21SenateSent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SEC/SFC
2020-01-21SenateSent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback