NM SB3 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-10 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 262 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Campaign Finance Reporting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign Finance Reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-10SenateSigned by Governor - Chapter 262 - Apr. 4
2019-03-10SenateSenate has concurred with House Amendments
2019-03-09HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:48 N:17
2019-03-03HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-14HouseSent to HJC - Referrals: HJC
2019-02-13SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:36 N:6
2019-02-11SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-01-28SenateSRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-16SenateSent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC
2019-01-15SenateSent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback