NM SB3 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-08 - [LD 39] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Hydrogen fuel production tax credit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hydrogen fuel production tax credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-08House[LD 39] Action postponed indefinitely
2013-03-08House[LD 39] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue
2013-03-08House[LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted
2013-02-28House[LD 33] Referred to House Business & Industry
2013-02-28House[LD 33] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Taxation & Revenue
2013-02-14Senate[LD 23] Passed Senate (37-0)
2013-02-08Senate[LD 19] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2013-01-18Senate[LD 4] Referred to Senate Finance
2013-01-18Senate[LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted
2013-01-15Senate[LD 1] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2013-01-15Senate[LD 1] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance
2013-01-15Senate[LD 1] Senate Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback