NM SB287 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Procurement code emergency procurements
Title
Procurement code emergency procurements
Sponsors
Sen. Sander Rue [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-19 | [LD 26] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-19 | [LD 26] Referred to House Judiciary | |
2012-02-19 | [LD 26] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs | |
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Passed Senate (35-0) | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-25 | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-01-25 | [LD 7] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=287&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0287.pdf |