NM SB282 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Immunity For Overdose Assistance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immunity For Overdose Assistance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseAction Postponed Indefinitely
2019-03-05HouseHHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-24HouseSent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC
2019-02-22SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0
2019-02-21SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-13SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-21SenateSent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback