NM SB279 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - [LD 44] Passed House (37-10) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.130.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - [LD 44] Passed House (37-10) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.130.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sustainable building tax credits
Title
Sustainable building tax credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | [LD 44] Passed House (37-10) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.130. |
2015-03-19 | House | [LD 43] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] HWMC |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Passed Senate (35-5) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |