NM SB257 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (65-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (65-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Charter schools & public audit changes
Title
Charter schools & public audit changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (65-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2015-03-20 | House | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | [LD 42] Referred to House Education |
2015-03-18 | House | [LD 42] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-04 | House | [LD 32] HGEIC |
2015-03-04 | House | [LD 32] HGEIC and then to House Education |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Education |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Public Affairs |