NM SB255 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (64-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (64-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Valencia county off-campus center
Title
Valencia county off-campus center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (64-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] HWMC |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] Referred to House Education |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] Assigned to House Education and then to HWMC |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Passed Senate (34-5) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Education |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |