NM SB251 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 112 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Metro Development Act Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Metro Development Act Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-04SenateSigned by Governor - Chapter 112 - Apr. 4
2023-03-16HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:60 N:1
2023-03-15HouseHTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2023-03-13HouseReferred to: HTRC
2023-03-13HouseWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2023-03-08HouseSent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC
2023-03-06SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:42 N:0
2023-03-03SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2023-02-22SenateSTBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2023-01-26SenateSent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback