NM SB247 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Passed House (63-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.29) Ch. 71.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Passed House (63-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.29) Ch. 71.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Childhood development services procurement
Title
Childhood development services procurement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Passed House (63-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.29) Ch. 71. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Referred to House Education |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Assigned to House Education and then to House Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Passed Senate (40-1) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Education |
2013-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Education |