NM SB245 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Separate Fire Marshall From Prc
Title
Separate Fire Marshall From Prc
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-18 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-15 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SJC/SFC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=245&year=20 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/20%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0245.pdf |