NM SB244 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Immunizations Detrimental To Some Children
Title
Immunizations Detrimental To Some Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2021-03-08 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-24 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SJC |