NM SB239 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School Capital Outlay For Security
Title
School Capital Outlay For Security
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 71 |
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (65-0) |
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-05 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Education |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |