NM SB234 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Passed House (66-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Purchase Of Emergency Communications Gear

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Purchase Of Emergency Communications Gear

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Passed House (66-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance Assigned to Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2017-01-26House[LD 10] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue
2017-01-26House[LD 10] Assigned to House Taxation & Revenue and then to House Appropriations & Finance
2017-02-08Senate[LD 23] Passed Senate (32-0)
2017-02-02Senate[LD 17] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2017-01-27Senate[LD 11] Referred to Senate Finance
2017-01-27Senate[LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-20Senate[LD 4] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2017-01-20Senate[LD 4] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback