NM SB230 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Institutional Racism In State Agencies
Title
Institutional Racism In State Agencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-15 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC |
2021-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:29 N:7 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SJC |