NM SB23 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health Care Purchasing Act
Title
Health Care Purchasing Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-13 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:32 N:7 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/STBT |