NM SB23 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 9] Passed House (63-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 9] Passed House (63-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Government Planning Fund
Title
Local Government Planning Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 9] Passed House (63-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-26 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-01-26 | Senate | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-01-18 | Senate | [LD 3] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |