NM SB226 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (32-31) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 3) Ch. 34.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (32-31) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 3) Ch. 34.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Use of public water & landowner protection
Title
Use of public water & landowner protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (32-31) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 3) Ch. 34. |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (32-7) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary |