NM SB225 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 95 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 95 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Air Medal License Plate
Title
Air Medal License Plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 95 - Mar. 28 |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0 |
2019-03-09 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-05 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-14 | House | Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HTRC |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCORC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |