NM SB225 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 35
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Corporation Biennial Report Due Dates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporation Biennial Report Due Dates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14Senate[LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 35
2018-02-14House[LD 10] Passed House (63-0)
2018-02-14House[LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-01-29House[LD 8] Referred to House Business & Industry
2018-01-29House[LD 8] Referred to House Business & Industry
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Passed Senate (40-0)
2018-02-09Senate[LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-02-09Senate[LD 15] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2018-02-09Senate[LD 15] Referred to Senate Judiciary Assigned to Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2018-02-09Senate[LD 14] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2018-02-09Senate[LD 14] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session
2018-01-29Senate[LD 8] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee
2018-01-29Senate[LD 8] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback