NM SB223 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Geothermal Resource Development & Regulation
Title
Geothermal Resource Development & Regulation
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Griggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 78 |
2016-02-03 | House | [LD 16] Passed House (63-0) |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Energy, Environment & Natural Resources |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (42-0) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Floor amendment adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2016-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary |