NM SB220 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (64-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.111.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (64-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.111.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hmo credentialing requirements
Title
Hmo credentialing requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (64-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.111. |
2015-03-20 | House | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | [LD 35] HBEC |
2015-03-09 | House | [LD 35] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-24 | House | [LD 26] HHC |
2015-02-24 | House | [LD 26] HHC and then to HBEC |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |