NM SB213 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Support For Transferring Students
Title
Support For Transferring Students
Sponsors
Sen. Gay Kernan [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-28 | Senate | [LD 12] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 85 |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (60-0) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Education |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] HHouse Health |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] HHouse Health and then to House Education |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (31-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Education |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |