NM SB210 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Distributed Generation Consumer Protection
Title
Distributed Generation Consumer Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-18 | Senate | [LD 33] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (59-1) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary |
2017-01-30 | Senate | [LD 14] Passed Senate (34-7) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |