NM SB204 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 20] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 20] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcohol & Private Celebrations
Title
Alcohol & Private Celebrations
Sponsors
Sen. John Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | [LD 20] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2018-01-30 | House | [LD 9] Passed House (58-6) |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 8] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (34-2) |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Floor amendment adopted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-02-03 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-02-03 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-26 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-26 | Senate | [LD 7] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |