NM SB2 | 2017 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - [LD 4] Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Tax Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - House - (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27Senate[LD 4] Vetoed by the Governor and date.
2017-05-27Senate[LD 4] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill
2017-05-26House[LD 3] Passed House (37-28)
2017-05-26House[LD 3] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2017-05-25House[LD 2] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue
2017-05-25House[LD 2] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue
2017-05-26Senate[LD 3] Passed Senate (25-16)
2017-05-25Senate[LD 2] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-05-24Senate[LD 1] Referred to Senate Finance
2017-05-24Senate[LD 1] Referred to Senate Finance

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback