NM SB2 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 47] Signed by one or both houses (Mar.15) Ch. 19.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State aviation fund uses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State aviation fund uses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-10 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-16Senate[LD 47] Signed by one or both houses (Mar.15) Ch. 19.
2013-03-11Senate[LD 40] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill
2013-03-08House[LD 39] Passed House (64-0)
2013-03-08House[LD 39] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2013-03-01House[LD 34] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance
2013-03-01House[LD 34] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2013-02-21House[LD 28] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works
2013-02-21House[LD 28] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Appropriations & Finance
2013-02-07Senate[LD 18] Passed Senate (38-0)
2013-02-01Senate[LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted
2013-01-18Senate[LD 4] Referred to Senate Finance
2013-01-18Senate[LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted
2013-01-15Senate[LD 1] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2013-01-15Senate[LD 1] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance
2013-01-15Senate[LD 1] Senate Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback