NM SB199 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - [LD 42] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - [LD 42] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Land grant-merced project finance act
Title
Land grant-merced project finance act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | [LD 42] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-18 | House | [LD 42] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2015-03-18 | House | [LD 42] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-04 | House | [LD 32] HGEIC |
2015-03-04 | House | [LD 32] HGEIC and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2015-02-27 | Senate | [LD 29] Passed Senate (25-10) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | [LD 29] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |