NM SB193 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 62 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 62 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Equity Ombudsman
Title
Rural Equity Ombudsman
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Armstrong [R] | Sen. Crystal Diamond Brantley [R] | Sen. Siah Correa Hemphill [D] | Rep. Luis Terrazas [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 62 - Apr. 5 |
2021-03-17 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:69 N:0 |
2021-03-11 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-09 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SIRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-01-31 | Senate | Sent to SIRC - Referrals: SIRC/SFC |