NM SB193 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - [LD 14] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - [LD 14] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ski Area Alcoholic Beverage Sales
Title
Ski Area Alcoholic Beverage Sales
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Moores [R] | Rep. James Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 76 |
2016-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Passed House (38-30) |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Passed Senate (33-4) |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-21 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |