NM SB184 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - [LD 31] LAW WITHOUT SIGNATURE (Mar. 18) Ch. .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - [LD 31] LAW WITHOUT SIGNATURE (Mar. 18) Ch. .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Horse Racing Licenses, Health & Testing
Title
Horse Racing Licenses, Health & Testing
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Papen [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] LAW WITHOUT SIGNATURE (Mar. 18) Ch. . |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (65-1) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife |
2017-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife and then to House Judiciary |
2017-01-31 | Senate | [LD 15] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |