NM SB182 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Licensure Of Pharmacists
Title
Licensure Of Pharmacists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-09 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-05 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HSEIC |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCORC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |