NM SB181 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Interior Designer Licensure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interior Designer Licensure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateVetoed by Governor
2019-03-13SenateSenate has concurred with House Amendments
2019-03-13HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:45 N:19
2019-03-13HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2019-03-10HouseHSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-05HouseHCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-14HouseSent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HSEIC
2019-02-13SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:42 N:0
2019-02-12SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-01-23SenateReferred to: SCORC
2019-01-23SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2019-01-17SenateSent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC
2019-01-15SenateSent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback