NM SB170 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 8] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 8] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water Project Fund Projects
Title
Water Project Fund Projects
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Cervantes [D] | Sen. Carlos Cisneros [D] | Sen. George Munoz [D] | Sen. Mary Papen [D] |
Sen. Nancy Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Mimi Stewart [D] | Sen. Peter Wirth [D] | Sen. Pat Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 8] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 15 |
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (67-0) |
2018-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2018-02-03 | Senate | [LD 11] Passed Senate (36-0) |
2018-02-03 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2018-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance |