NM SB164 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - [LD 21] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - [LD 21] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance Code Changes
Title
Insurance Code Changes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | [LD 21] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-08 | Senate | [LD 21] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2016-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=164&year=16 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/16%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0164.pdf |