NM SB16 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 50] Passed House (68-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 50] Passed House (68-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public campaign financing changes
Title
Public campaign financing changes
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Passed House (68-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Referred to House Voters & Elections |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Assigned to House Voters & Elections and then to House Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Passed Senate (33-7) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |