NM SB159 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 16 - Feb. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 16 - Feb. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative Retirement Changes
Title
Legislative Retirement Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 16 - Feb. 28 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate has concurred with House Amendments |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:5 |
2022-02-14 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-02-08 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:0 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-01 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-01-25 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SHPAC/SFC |