NM SB159 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: House Taxation & Revenue Committee
Hearing: Feb 19 @ 8:30 am in Room 317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Distributions To School Districts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distributions To School Districts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17HouseHEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-13HouseSent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HTRC
2020-02-13SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0
2020-02-11SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-05SenateSEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-01-28SenateSCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
2020-01-27SenateSent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SEC/SFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback