NM SB158 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Anatomical Gift Discrimination
Title
Anatomical Gift Discrimination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2022-02-16 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-08 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:0 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2022-02-07 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SJC/STBTC |