NM SB157 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 31 - Feb. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sick Leave For Educational Retirement Credit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sick Leave For Educational Retirement Credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateSigned by Governor - Chapter 31 - Feb. 4
2019-01-31HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:52 N:15
2019-01-30HouseHTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-25HouseSent to HTRC - Referrals: HTRC
2019-01-24SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0
2019-01-21SenateSEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-17SenateSent to SEC - Referrals: SEC
2019-01-15SenateSent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback