NM SB157 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on January 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - [LD 9] Passed House (64-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Phased-in Teacher Cost Index

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Phased-in Teacher Cost Index

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-31House[LD 9] Passed House (64-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
2018-02-13House[LD 8] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-01-24House[LD 6] Referred to House Education
2018-01-24House[LD 6] Assigned to House Education and then to House Appropriations & Finance
2018-02-03Senate[LD 11] Passed Senate (38-0)
2018-02-03Senate[LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2018-01-31Senate[LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance
2018-01-31Senate[LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-01-24Senate[LD 6] Referred to Senate Education
2018-01-24Senate[LD 6] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session
2018-01-23Senate[LD 5] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee
2018-01-23Senate[LD 5] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback