NM SB150 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase severance tax distributions
Title
Increase severance tax distributions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=150&year=15 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/15%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0150.pdf |