NM SB148 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (54-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.108.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (54-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.108.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Charter school responsibilities
Title
Charter school responsibilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (54-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.108. |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Education |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Education |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |